+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Elections
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections