+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Polk,Clarke,Blount
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Barker,Turner
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2017: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 28, 2017: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 1, 2017: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 1, 2017: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor