+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Chism, Touchstone)
- Passed
- Amendment Failed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2016: Passed (Senate)
February 16, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
February 10, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor