+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: CR To AP
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections;Appropriations
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To CN
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: CN To AP
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2022: Passed (Senate)
February 8, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor