+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: PP To FI
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property;Finance
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges