+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Public Utilities
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 11, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor