+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 13, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor