+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: PH To MU
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: MU To PH
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Municipalities;Public Health and Human Services
+ − Vote
February 5, 2015: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor