+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations