+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Tabled Subject To Call
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2018: Passed (Senate)
February 8, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor