+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Weathersby, Hale)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor