+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Moore,Mayo,Busby
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Decline Concur/Inv Conf Lost
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Education