+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor