+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Tindell
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Read
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 24, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 24, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor