+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2018: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 7, 2018: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 1, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor