+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Banking and Financial Services