+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: AP To PO
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: PO To AP
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ports, Harbors and Airports;Appropriations
+ − Vote
February 14, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor