+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Vote
February 7, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor