+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor