+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: ED To EC
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Economic and Workforce Development
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Workforce Development
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
+ − Vote
February 3, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor