+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Ward
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Staples
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Eaton, Smith (39th), Rogers (61st))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 30, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 19, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 25, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor