+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), Howell, Lane)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Medicaid
+ − Vote
February 11, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor