+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2015: Passed (Senate)
February 5, 2015: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor