+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Polk,Fillingane,Tindell
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Brown (20th)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: UC To FI
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges;Finance
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 30, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 7, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 6, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor