+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (154)
- 025-0009-0120 -
- 027-0104-0155 -
- 027-0104-0161 -
- 027-0104-0105 -
- 005-0008-0003 -
- 005-0008-0007 -
- 025-0009-0107 -
- 047-0005-0357 -
- 049-0027-0071 -
- 065-0043-0003 -
- 073-0033-0005 -
- 075-0076-0021 -
- 077-0009-0531 -
- 005-0008-0005 -
- 005-0008-0009 -
- 005-0008-0011 -
- 005-0008-0013 -
- 005-0008-0017 -
- 005-0008-0019 -
- 005-0008-0021 -
- 005-0008-0023 -
- 007-0007-0203 -
- 007-0007-0211 -
- 007-0007-0216 -
- 007-0007-0225 -
- 011-0015-0101 -
- 025-0009-0115 -
- 025-0009-0119 -
- 025-0009-0121 -
- 025-0009-0123 -
- 025-0009-0135 -
- 025-0009-0143 -
- 025-0009-0171 -
- 025-0011-0015 -
- 025-0011-0143 -
- 025-0015-0005 -
- 025-0053-0003 -
- 025-0053-0005 -
- 025-0053-0021 -
- 025-0053-0025 -
- 025-0053-0029 -
- 025-0053-0101 -
- 025-0053-0105 -
- 025-0053-0107 -
- 025-0053-0109 -
- 025-0053-0111 -
- 025-0053-0119 -
- 025-0053-0121 -
- 025-0053-0123 -
- 025-0053-0125 -
- 025-0053-0151 -
- 025-0053-0171 -
- 025-0053-0191 -
- 027-0003-0013 -
- 029-0005-0002 -
- 031-0001-0001 -
- 031-0007-0001 -
- 031-0007-0105 -
- 031-0007-0119 -
- 031-0011-0003 -
- 031-0025-0019 -
- 031-0031-0007 -
- 033-0015-0017 -
- 035-0007-0007 -
- 037-0033-0157 -
- 037-0033-0163 -
- 037-0037-0003 -
- 037-0101-0043 -
- 037-0115-0025 -
- 037-0138-0009 -
- 041-0003-0015 -
- 041-0021-0141 -
- 041-0023-0043 -
- 041-0073-0005 -
- 041-0073-0019 -
- 041-0073-0027 -
- 041-0085-0003 -
- 041-0095-0005 -
- 043-0001-0002 -
- 043-0003-0009 -
- 043-0013-0117 -
- 043-0013-0121 -
- 043-0019-0047 -
- 043-0033-0717 -
- 043-0047-0009 -
- 047-0005-0005 -
- 047-0005-0035 -
- 047-0005-0037 -
- 049-0002-0009 -
- 051-0039-0005 -
- 051-0041-0017 -
- 055-0003-0033 -
- 055-0007-0025 -
- 055-0023-0043 -
- 057-0001-0221 -
- 057-0001-0355 -
- 057-0026-0001 -
- 057-0028-0001 -
- 057-0032-0005 -
- 057-0034-0007 -
- 057-0067-0011 -
- 057-0075-0009 -
- 057-0075-0011 -
- 057-0085-0005 -
- 057-0115-0003 -
- 059-0005-0015 -
- 061-0003-0063 -
- 061-0004-0011 -
- 065-0001-0009 -
- 065-0001-0085 -
- 065-0001-0141 -
- 065-0001-0173 -
- 065-0007-0107 -
- 065-0019-0077 -
- 065-0023-0209 -
- 065-0025-0101 -
- 065-0031-0001 -
- 069-0001-0014 -
- 069-0015-0007 -
- 069-0015-0011 -
- 069-0015-0101 -
- 069-0015-0201 -
- 071-0005-0121 -
- 073-0001-0001 -
- 073-0001-0003 -
- 073-0002-0016 -
- 073-0013-0003 -
- 073-0013-0015 -
- 073-0013-0041 -
- 073-0033-0001 -
- 073-0033-0016 -
- 073-0043-0011 -
- 073-0053-0008 -
- 073-0063-0017 -
- 075-0063-0081 -
- 075-0072-0103 -
- 077-0003-0105 -
- 077-0005-0741 -
- 077-0006-0033 -
- 079-0010-0005 -
- 079-0029-0902 -
- 081-0027-0008.115 -
- 083-0005-0211 -
- 083-0024-0041 -
- 083-0030-0043 -
- 083-0034-0003 -
- 083-0051-0031 -
- 093-0021-0033 -
- 099-0018-0007 -
- 099-0039-0107 -
- 025-0001-0100 -
- 025-0061-0009 -
- 005-0008-0001 -
- 005-0008-0015 -
+ − Votes (3)
March 23, 2015: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 11, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 11, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor