+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
- Recommitted to Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Vote
February 7, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor