+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moak, Smith (39th), Rogers (61st))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor