+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property