+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2016: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 29, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 17, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor