+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: DP To JB
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Drug Policy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor