+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89
On March 27, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 26, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Frazier
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations