+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
February 11, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor