+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: AP To ED
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor