+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (20th), Horan, Mickens)
- Passed
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
February 13, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor