+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named DeBar,Boyd,Johnson
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bennett,McCarty,Deweese
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 27, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 10, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor