+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Vote
February 3, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor