+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor