+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Branning,Wilemon
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Bounds,Staples
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 29, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 6, 2019: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 7, 2019: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor