+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baria, Baker, Wilson)
- Passed
- Point of Order-Not Well Taken
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
- Point of Order Raised
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 1, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor