+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Bomgar, Smith, Lamar)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means