+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tindell,DeBar,Branning
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Gipson,Baker,Hood
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 24, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 2, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor