+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property;Finance
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Staples, Mettetal, Holloway)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges