+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2014: Passed (Senate)
February 6, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor