+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
- Recommitted to Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: IN To JB
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: JB To IN
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B;Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 13, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor