+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: ED To AP
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2013: Passed (Senate)
February 13, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor