+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
February 12, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor