+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 24, 2020 in the House:
- Veto Sustained
- Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
On August 10, 2020 in the House:
- Veto Referred To Judiciary B
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 28, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Wiggins,DeBar,England
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bain,Sanford,Owen
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B