+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Bennett, Roberson)
- Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2019: Passed (Senate)
February 11, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor