+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Collins,Lee,Fillingane
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Johnson,Eaton,Arnold
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 31, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 11, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 6, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor