+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: CA To FI
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To County Affairs;Finance
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor